Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/23/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 10/23/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/23/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 10/23/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/23/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 10/28/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/19/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/21/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/10/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 11/12/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 11/14/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 12/11/2014