Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 02/15/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/15/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/15/2013
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31] 02/15/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/28/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 02/28/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45] 03/06/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 03/06/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/06/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 03/14/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 04/18/2013