Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 10/22/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 11/14/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 11/15/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 11/19/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 11/20/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 11/20/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 11/21/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 12/02/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 12/03/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 12/05/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 12/12/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 12/19/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 01/09/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 01/14/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 01/27/2014
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 01/28/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 01/28/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 02/04/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/05/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/04/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 03/24/2014
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/24/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/01/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 04/01/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 04/28/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 05/20/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 05/20/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 05/23/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 06/10/2014
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 06/20/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 06/30/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/29/2014