Refine your search

8 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
12/26/2013 Became Public Law No: 113-66.
12/26/2013 Signed by President.
12/23/2013 Presented to President.
12/19/2013 Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to the House amendment to the Senate amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 84 - 15. Record Vote Number: 284.(consideration: CR S9067-9068)
11/19/2013 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.
11/19/2013 Senate Committee on Armed Services discharged by Unanimous Consent.
10/28/2013 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6778-6779)
10/22/2013 Introduced in House