Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 10/30/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 11/20/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 11/20/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 02/27/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 03/06/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 03/12/2014
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 03/13/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 11/12/2014