Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 10/22/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 11/14/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 12/05/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 02/28/2014