Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 10/23/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 10/23/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 10/23/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/28/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/28/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 10/28/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 10/28/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 10/28/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 10/30/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 10/30/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/30/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 11/14/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 12/11/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 12/12/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 02/04/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/28/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 07/09/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 07/14/2014