Refine your search

Refined by:

California Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 10/30/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 02/27/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 03/06/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 03/13/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 05/01/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/01/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/08/2014