Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 12/04/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 01/10/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 02/26/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 05/06/2014