Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 10/23/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 10/30/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 11/15/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 01/10/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 03/05/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 03/21/2014