Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 11/15/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 05/08/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 05/15/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 05/15/2014
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/15/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 05/20/2014
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/24/2014
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 07/08/2014
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/08/2014