Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 10/28/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 10/28/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 10/28/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 11/12/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 11/12/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/18/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 11/20/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 12/03/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 12/09/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/09/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/11/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 12/12/2013