Refine your search

Refined by:

New York Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 11/15/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 11/20/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 12/03/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 01/31/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/06/2014