Refine your search

8 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
12/18/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-250.
12/18/2014 Signed by President.
12/13/2014 Presented to President.
12/11/2014 Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.(consideration: CR H10303-10304)
12/11/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S6607)
12/11/2014 Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
05/06/2014 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H3424)
10/23/2013 Introduced in House