Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3]* 01/22/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 01/23/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 01/23/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 01/23/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 01/23/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/23/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 01/23/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 01/23/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 01/23/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/23/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 01/23/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/23/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 01/23/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 01/23/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 01/23/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/23/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 01/23/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 01/23/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 01/23/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 01/23/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/04/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/04/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 02/04/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/04/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/04/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 02/06/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 02/06/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/06/2013
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 02/06/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/06/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 02/06/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 02/06/2013
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 02/06/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/13/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/13/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/13/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/13/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/13/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 02/13/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 02/13/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/13/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/13/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 02/15/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/15/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 02/15/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 02/15/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 02/15/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 02/26/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 02/26/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/06/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/06/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 03/06/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 03/06/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 03/06/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/13/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/13/2013
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 03/13/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 03/13/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 03/21/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 03/21/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 03/21/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 03/21/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/15/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 04/15/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 04/15/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 05/07/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 05/07/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/07/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 05/07/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/17/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 05/17/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/17/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 06/12/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 06/12/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/26/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 06/26/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 06/26/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 06/26/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/26/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/10/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 07/10/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 07/10/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 07/10/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 07/10/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/17/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 07/17/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 07/17/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 08/02/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 08/02/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/23/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 10/23/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 10/23/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 10/23/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 12/12/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 12/12/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/12/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 02/03/2014
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 04/01/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 04/01/2014
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/01/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 04/01/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 04/28/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/28/2014
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/15/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/15/2014
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 07/15/2014
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 07/17/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/23/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 07/29/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/29/2014
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/29/2014
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 07/30/2014
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 07/30/2014
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/30/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/30/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/30/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 07/30/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/31/2014
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 07/31/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 07/31/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/31/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 07/31/2014