Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 10/23/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 02/04/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 03/26/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/29/2014
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 11/19/2014