Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 10/23/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 10/29/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 10/29/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 10/29/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 10/30/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 11/13/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 11/19/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 12/03/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 12/03/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 12/10/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 02/28/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/05/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/05/2014
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/11/2014
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 07/23/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 07/25/2014