There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Keystone For a Secure Tomorrow Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To approve the Keystone XL pipeline project permit.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/22/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date All Actions
01/28/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/25/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/23/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
01/22/2013Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/22/2013Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/22/2013Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/22/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (42)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/22/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 01/23/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 01/23/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/23/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 01/23/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 01/23/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 01/23/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 01/23/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 01/29/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 01/29/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/29/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 01/29/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 01/29/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 02/04/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 02/05/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 02/06/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/06/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/06/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 02/12/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 02/12/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 02/12/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 02/13/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/15/2013
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31] 02/15/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/25/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 03/04/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/05/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/20/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 04/09/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/09/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/09/2013

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure01/22/2013 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials01/23/2013 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce01/22/2013 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Energy and Power01/25/2013 Referred to
House Natural Resources01/22/2013 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands and Environmental Regulation01/28/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.334.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.334. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/22/2013)

Keystone For a Secure Tomorrow Act - Approves a specified permit regarding certain energy-related facilities and land transportation crossings on the international boundaries of the United States for the Keystone XL pipeline project. Includes within such permit the Nebraska reroute evaluated in the Final Evaluation Report issued the Nebraska Department of Environmental Quality in January 2013.

Prescribes permit requirements.