Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/22/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 01/23/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 01/23/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/23/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 01/23/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 01/23/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 01/23/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 01/23/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 01/29/2013
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 01/29/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/29/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 01/29/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 01/29/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 02/04/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 02/05/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 02/06/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/06/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/06/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 02/12/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 02/12/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 02/12/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 02/13/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/15/2013
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31] 02/15/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 02/25/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/25/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 03/04/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/05/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/20/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 04/09/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/09/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/09/2013