Refine your search

16 results for All Actions
Date Chamber All Actions
12/26/2013 Became Public Law No: 113-71.
Type of Action: To President
12/26/2013 Signed by President.
Type of Action: To President
12/23/2013 House Presented to President.
12/20/2013 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
12/20/2013 Senate Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9111)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
11/19/2013 Senate Received in the Senate, read twice.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
11/18/2013-5:26pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7162)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
11/18/2013-5:14pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3343.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
11/18/2013-5:14pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7162-7163)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
11/18/2013-5:14pm House Mr. Issa moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
11/15/2013 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 190.
Type of Action: Calendars
11/15/2013 House Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 113-267.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Oversight and Government Reform
10/29/2013 House Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Oversight and Government Reform
10/29/2013 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Oversight and Government Reform
10/28/2013 House Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
10/28/2013 House Introduced in House
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral