Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 11/13/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 12/09/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 12/11/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 12/11/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 12/11/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 01/08/2014
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 01/09/2014
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 01/09/2014
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 01/09/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 01/09/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/10/2014
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/10/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/14/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 01/14/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 01/14/2014
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/15/2014
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 01/15/2014
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 01/17/2014
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 01/17/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 01/17/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 01/17/2014
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 01/17/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 01/17/2014
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/27/2014
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 01/27/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 01/27/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/27/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/28/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 02/04/2014
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 02/10/2014
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 02/10/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 02/10/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 02/11/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/11/2014
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 02/11/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 02/25/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/25/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 02/25/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 02/25/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/27/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 03/05/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/05/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 03/05/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/24/2014
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 03/26/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 04/01/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 04/01/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 04/03/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/08/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 04/10/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/10/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 04/28/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 04/28/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 04/28/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 04/28/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 04/29/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/29/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 04/30/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 04/30/2014
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 04/30/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 05/01/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 05/02/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 05/02/2014
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 05/06/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 05/06/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/06/2014
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 05/08/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/09/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/19/2014
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 05/19/2014
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 05/19/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 05/19/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/22/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew