Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 10/29/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 10/30/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 10/30/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 10/30/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 11/12/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 11/12/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/12/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 11/19/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/19/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/19/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 12/09/2013