Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 01/22/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 01/22/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 01/22/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/22/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 01/23/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 01/23/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 01/23/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 01/23/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/23/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 01/23/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 01/23/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 01/23/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 01/23/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 01/23/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 01/23/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/23/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 01/29/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/29/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 01/29/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 01/29/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 01/29/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/29/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 01/29/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 01/29/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 01/29/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 01/29/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 01/29/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 01/29/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/29/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/01/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 02/01/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 02/01/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 02/01/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 02/04/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 02/04/2013
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 02/06/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/06/2013
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/06/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 02/06/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 02/06/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 02/06/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 02/06/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/12/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/12/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/12/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 02/12/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 02/12/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 02/12/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 02/14/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 02/14/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 02/14/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 02/14/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 02/14/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 02/15/2013
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31] 02/15/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 02/25/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/27/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 02/27/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/27/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/28/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 02/28/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/13/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 03/13/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 03/13/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/19/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 03/19/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 04/09/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 04/09/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 04/09/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 04/12/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 04/17/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/23/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 05/08/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/15/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/18/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 09/10/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 09/10/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 02/25/2014