Refine your search

Showing 26 of 26 total for All Actions.
Date Chamber All Actions
12/20/2013 Senate Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: Senate
11/18/2013 Senate Received in the Senate.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: Senate
11/15/2013-1:35pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
11/15/2013-1:35pm House On passage Passed by recorded vote: 261 - 157 (Roll no. 587). (text: CR H7128)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
11/15/2013-1:28pm House On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 187 - 230 (Roll no. 586). (consideration: CR H7143-7144)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
11/15/2013-1:21pm House The previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. (consideration: CR H7143)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
11/15/2013-1:13pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Andrews motion to recommit with instructions, pending the reservation of a point of order. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to give insurance companies the option to continue offering non-Affordable Care Act compliant plans through 2014 to current enrollees only, as long as those plans were in effect as of October 1, 2013. The motion also requires insurance companies to notify consumers of the differences between these extended plans and the options, credits, and subsidies available through the Affordable Care Acts exchanges, as well as instructions on how to receive them. Subsequently, the reservation of a point of order was withdrawn.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
11/15/2013-1:08pm House Mr. Andrews moved to recommit with instructions to Energy and Commerce. (consideration: CR H7142-7144; text: CR H7142-7143)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
11/15/2013-1:08pm House On motion to table the motion to appeal the ruling of the chair Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: 229 - 191 (Roll no. 585).
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
11/15/2013-12:43pm House Mr. Upton moved to table the motion to appeal the ruling of the chair (consideration: CR H7142)
Type of Action: Resolving Differences
Action By: House of Representatives
11/15/2013-12:42pm House Mr. Andrews appealed the ruling of the chair. The question was then put on sustaining the ruling of the chair.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
11/15/2013-12:39pm House Point of order sustained against the motion to recommit with instructions.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
11/15/2013-12:39pm House Mr. Upton raised a point of order against the motion to recommit with instructions. Mr. Upton stated that the amendment was not germane to the underlying bill. Sustained by the Chair.
Type of Action: Resolving Differences
Action By: House of Representatives
11/15/2013-12:33pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Andrews motion to recommit with instructions, pending the reservation of a point of order. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to replace the underlying bill with an entire new text.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
11/15/2013-12:31pm House Mr. Andrews moved to recommit with instructions to Energy and Commerce. (consideration: CR H7139-7142; text: CR H7139-7140)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
11/15/2013-12:31pm House The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H7139)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
11/15/2013-11:08am House DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 3350.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
11/15/2013-11:07am House Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3350 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
11/15/2013-11:07am House Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 413. (consideration: CR H7128-7145)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
11/15/2013-11:07am House Rule H. Res. 413 passed House.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
11/14/2013-7:10pm House Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 413 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3350 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
11/01/2013 House Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Energy and Commerce
10/28/2013 House Referred to House Ways and Means
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
10/28/2013 House Referred to House Energy and Commerce
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
10/28/2013 House Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
10/28/2013 House Introduced in House
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives