Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 10/29/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 10/29/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 10/29/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 10/30/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 11/12/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 11/12/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 11/13/2013