Refine your search

Refined by:

North Carolina Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 10/28/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 10/29/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 10/30/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/30/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 11/12/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 11/12/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 11/12/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 11/12/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/12/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 11/14/2013