Text: H.R.3350 — 113th Congress (2013-2014)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Bill text available as:

Shown Here:
Referred in Senate (12/20/2013)


113th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 3350

IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES
November 18, 2013

Received

December 20, 2013

Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions


AN ACT

To authorize health insurance issuers to continue to offer for sale current individual health insurance coverage in satisfaction of the minimum essential health insurance coverage requirement, and for other purposes.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Keep Your Health Plan Act of 2013”.

SEC. 2. If you like your health care plan, you can keep it.

(a) In general.—Notwithstanding any provision of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (including any amendment made by such Act or by the Health Care and Education Reconciliation Act of 2010), a health insurance issuer that has in effect health insurance coverage in the individual market as of January 1, 2013, may continue after such date to offer such coverage for sale during 2014 in such market outside of an Exchange established under section 1311 or 1321 of such Act (42 U.S.C. 18031, 18041).

(b) Treatment as grandfathered health plan in satisfaction of minimum essential coverage.—Health insurance coverage described in subsection (a) shall be treated as a grandfathered health plan for purposes of the amendment made by section 1501(b) of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act.

Passed the House of Representatives November 15, 2013.

Attest: karen l. haas,   
Clerk