Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 10/28/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 10/30/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 11/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/15/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 06/09/2014
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/25/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 09/08/2014