Refine your search

24 results for All Actions
Date Chamber All Actions
06/05/2014 Senate Select Committee on Intelligence. Hearings held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: Senate Intelligence
06/02/2014 Senate Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
05/22/2014-11:04am House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/22/2014-11:04am House On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 303 - 121 (Roll no. 230). (text: CR H4789-4793)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/22/2014-10:31am House The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H4803)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/22/2014-10:29am House The House resumed debate on H.R. 3361.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/22/2014-9:17am House DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 3361.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/22/2014-9:15am House Rule provides further consideration of H.R. 4435. No amendment shall be in order except those printed in part A of the report. At the conclusion of consideration for amendment, the Committee shall rise and report the bill to the House with such further amendments as may have been adopted. The previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motion except one motion to recommit with or without instructions. The rule also provides for consideration of H.R. 3361. All points of order against consideration are waived. The bill, as amended by part B of the report
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/22/2014-9:15am House Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 590. (consideration: CR H4789-4804)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/21/2014-6:00pm House Rule H. Res. 590 passed House.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/21/2014-1:44am House Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 590 Reported to House. Rule provides further consideration of H.R. 4435. No amendment shall be in order except those printed in part A of the report. At the conclusion of consideration for amendment, the Committee shall rise and report the bill to the House with such further amendments as may have been adopted. The previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motion except one motion to recommit with or without instructions. The rule also provides for consideration of H.R. 3361. All points of order against consideration are waived. The bill, as amended by part B of the report
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
05/15/2014 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 334.
Type of Action: Calendars
05/15/2014 House Committee on Financial Services discharged.
Type of Action: Committee Discharge
05/15/2014 House Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Intelligence. H. Rept. 113-452, Part II.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Intelligence (Permanent)
05/15/2014 House Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 113-452, Part I.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Judiciary
05/07/2014 House Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 32 - 0.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Judiciary
05/07/2014 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Judiciary
05/06/2014 House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations Discharged.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Judiciary
01/09/2014 House Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Judiciary
10/29/2013 House Referred to House Financial Services
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
10/29/2013 House Referred to House Intelligence (Permanent)
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
10/29/2013 House Referred to House Judiciary
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
10/29/2013 House Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Intelligence (Permanent Select), and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
10/29/2013 House Introduced in House
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral