Refine your search

Refined by:

Georgia Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/30/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 01/07/2014
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 01/10/2014