Refine your search

Refined by:

Texas Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 10/29/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 10/30/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 12/03/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 12/11/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 01/07/2014
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/04/2014