Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 10/29/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 10/29/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 10/30/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/30/2013
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 10/30/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/30/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 10/30/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/13/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 11/13/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 11/13/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 11/13/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 11/13/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 11/15/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/15/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 11/20/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 11/21/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 12/03/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/03/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 12/03/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/11/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/11/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 12/11/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 12/11/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 12/16/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 12/19/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/19/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 01/07/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 01/07/2014
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 01/10/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 01/28/2014
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 01/28/2014
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 01/29/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 02/05/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 02/10/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/11/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 02/25/2014
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 02/26/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 02/27/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 03/04/2014
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 03/05/2014
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 03/12/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/06/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 05/07/2014
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/07/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 05/07/2014