Refine your search

Showing 17 of 17 total for All Actions.
Date Chamber All Actions
01/27/2014 Senate Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: Senate
01/16/2014-12:01pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
01/16/2014-12:01pm House On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 259 - 154 (Roll no. 23).
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
01/16/2014-11:52am House On motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 186 - 226 (Roll no. 22). (consideration: CR H1228)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
01/16/2014-11:25am House The previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. (consideration: CR H1227)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
01/16/2014-11:17am House DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Clark(MA) motion to recommit with instructions pending reservation of a point of order. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment inserting a new section on Disclosure of Lower Costs and Additional Health Benefits Provided to Individuals and Families. Subsequently, the reservation was removed.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
01/16/2014-11:17am House Ms. Clark (MA) moved to recommit with instructions to Energy and Commerce. (consideration: CR H1226)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
01/16/2014-11:17am House The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H1226: text: CR H1226)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
01/16/2014-10:14am House DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 3362.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
01/16/2014-10:13am House The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 2279, H.R. 3362, and H.R. 3811. In each case, general debate shall be confined to one hour and one motion to recommit is allowed. The resolution specifies certain amendments are in order for H.R. 2279. Further amendments to H.R. 3362 and H.R. 3811 are not in order.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
01/16/2014-10:13am House Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 455. (consideration: CR H1218-1228)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
01/08/2014-6:54pm House Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 455 Reported to House. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 2279, H.R. 3362, and H.R. 3811. In each case, general debate shall be confined to one hour and one motion to recommit is allowed. The resolution specifies certain amendments are in order for H.R. 2279. Further amendments to H.R. 3362 and H.R. 3811 are not in order.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
11/01/2013 House Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Energy and Commerce
10/29/2013 House Referred to House Ways and Means
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
10/29/2013 House Referred to House Energy and Commerce
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
10/29/2013 House Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
10/29/2013 House Introduced in House
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives