There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Exchange Information Disclosure Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Exchange Information Disclosure Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act to require transparency in the operation of American Health Benefit Exchanges.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
01/16/2014Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 259 - 154 (Roll no. 23).
10/29/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/27/2014SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
01/16/2014-12:01pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 259 - 154 (Roll no. 23).
01/16/2014-12:01pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/16/2014-11:52amHouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 186 - 226 (Roll no. 22). (consideration: CR H1228)
01/16/2014-11:25amHouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. (consideration: CR H1227)
01/16/2014-11:17amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Clark(MA) motion to recommit with instructions pending reservation of a point of order. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment inserting a new section on Disclosure of Lower Costs and Additional Health Benefits Provided to Individuals and Families. Subsequently, the reservation was removed.
01/16/2014-11:17amHouseMs. Clark (MA) moved to recommit with instructions to Energy and Commerce. (consideration: CR H1226)
01/16/2014-11:17amHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H1226: text: CR H1226)
01/16/2014-10:14amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 3362.
01/16/2014-10:13amHouseH.Amdt.531 On agreeing to the Rules amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection.
01/16/2014-10:13amHouseH.Amdt.531 Amendment reported by the House Committee on Rules. (consideration: CR H1218-1219; text: CR H1219)
01/16/2014-10:13amHouseThe resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 2279, H.R. 3362, and H.R. 3811. In each case, general debate shall be confined to one hour and one motion to recommit is allowed. The resolution specifies certain amendments are in order for H.R. 2279. Further amendments to H.R. 3362 and H.R. 3811 are not in order.
01/16/2014-10:13amHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 455. (consideration: CR H1218-1228)
01/08/2014-6:54pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 455 Reported to House. The resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 2279, H.R. 3362, and H.R. 3811. In each case, general debate shall be confined to one hour and one motion to recommit is allowed. The resolution specifies certain amendments are in order for H.R. 2279. Further amendments to H.R. 3362 and H.R. 3811 are not in order.
11/01/2013HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
10/29/2013HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
10/29/2013HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
10/29/2013HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (9)


Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce10/29/2013 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health11/01/2013 Referred to
House Ways and Means10/29/2013 Referred to
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions01/27/2014 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3362. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (01/16/2014)

Exchange Information Disclosure Act - Amends the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act to expand reporting requirements related to health care exchanges. Requires the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to publish reports weekly through March 30, 2015, on: (1) consumer interactions with healthcare.gov or subsequent sites and any efforts undertaken to remedy problems that impact taxpayers and consumers; (2) calls to the federal customer service call center, including the number of calls received by the call center, problems identified by users, and referrals of those calls; (3) all navigators and certified application counselors that have been trained and certified by health care exchanges; and (4) all agents and brokers who have been trained and certified by the federal health care exchange.