Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 11/15/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 11/15/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 11/19/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 01/07/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 01/07/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/07/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/09/2014
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 01/09/2014