Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 10/30/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 11/12/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 11/12/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/12/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 11/18/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 11/18/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 12/09/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 03/12/2014