Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 11/12/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 11/12/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 11/12/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 11/13/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 11/14/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 11/15/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 11/20/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/20/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 12/04/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 12/09/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 12/12/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 12/16/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 12/19/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 12/19/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 12/19/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 12/19/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 01/09/2014
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 01/16/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 01/27/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 01/27/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/28/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 01/28/2014
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/26/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 03/11/2014
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 03/11/2014
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 03/11/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 03/24/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/24/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 03/24/2014
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 03/24/2014
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 03/25/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/25/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/01/2014
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/01/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/01/2014
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 04/04/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/04/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 04/04/2014
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/10/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 04/28/2014
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/28/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/01/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/01/2014
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 05/01/2014
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/01/2014
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 05/01/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 05/09/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 05/09/2014
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 05/09/2014
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 05/09/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/09/2014
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 05/09/2014
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/09/2014
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 05/09/2014
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 05/09/2014
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/19/2014
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 05/19/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 05/19/2014
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 05/19/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 05/19/2014
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/19/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 05/28/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 05/28/2014
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 05/28/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 05/28/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/05/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 06/05/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/05/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 06/12/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/12/2014
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 06/17/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 06/17/2014
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/19/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 06/19/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/26/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/26/2014
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 06/26/2014
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 07/08/2014
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 07/14/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 07/16/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 07/22/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 07/22/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 07/24/2014
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 07/24/2014
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 07/29/2014
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/29/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 08/01/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/09/2014
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 09/15/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 09/15/2014
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/16/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 09/16/2014
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 09/18/2014
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 09/18/2014
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 09/18/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 11/13/2014