There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Hmong Veterans' Service Recognition Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to authorize the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to inter in national cemeteries individuals who supported the United States in Laos during the Vietnam War era.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/29/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
11/04/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
10/29/2013Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/29/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (43)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 10/29/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 10/29/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/13/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 11/13/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 11/13/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 11/18/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/05/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 12/05/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 01/10/2014
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 01/10/2014
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/09/2014
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/09/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/11/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 09/18/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 12/02/2014
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 12/02/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs10/29/2013 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs11/04/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3369. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/29/2013)

Hmong Veterans' Service Recognition Act - Authorizes burial in any open national cemetery under the control of the National Cemetery Administration of the remains of any individual: (1) who was naturalized pursuant to the Hmong Veterans' Naturalization Act of 2000 and who resided in the United States at the time of death; or (2) who the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (VA) determines served with a special guerrilla unit or irregular forces operating from a base in Laos in support of the U.S. Armed Forces between February 28, 1961, and May 7, 1975, and who, at the time of death, resided in the United States and was a U.S. citizen or an alien lawfully admitted for permanent residence.