Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 02/15/2013
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 03/20/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/25/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/25/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 04/12/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/10/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/23/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 09/25/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 01/07/2014
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 01/14/2014
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 01/27/2014