Refine your search

Refined by:

Ohio Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 10/30/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 10/30/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 11/12/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 12/11/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 12/12/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 02/14/2014