Refine your search

Refined by:

Virginia Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/12/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/20/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/04/2013
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 01/03/2014