Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 10/29/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 10/29/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 10/29/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 10/30/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 10/30/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 10/30/2013
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 10/30/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/30/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 10/30/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 10/30/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 10/30/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 11/12/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 11/12/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 11/12/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 11/14/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 11/18/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 11/18/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 11/18/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/18/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/20/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 11/20/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 11/20/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 11/21/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 12/04/2013
Rep. McAllister, Vance M. [R-LA-5] 12/04/2013
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 12/04/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/04/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 12/11/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/12/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 12/12/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 12/12/2013
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 01/03/2014
Rep. Rigell, E. Scott [R-VA-2] 01/03/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 01/10/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 01/10/2014
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 01/31/2014
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 02/05/2014
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 02/06/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 02/25/2014
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 02/25/2014