Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 11/14/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 11/18/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 01/09/2014
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 01/09/2014
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 01/14/2014
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 01/27/2014
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/11/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/26/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 03/26/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 04/01/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/01/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 04/01/2014
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 04/01/2014
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/01/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 04/01/2014
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/01/2014
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/01/2014
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/03/2014
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 04/03/2014
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 04/08/2014
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/08/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/09/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 04/09/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 04/10/2014
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/28/2014
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/28/2014
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/28/2014
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/30/2014
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/22/2014
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 06/11/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 06/30/2014
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 07/14/2014