Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 11/13/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 12/03/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 12/09/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 12/09/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/19/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 01/08/2014
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 01/10/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 02/03/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 02/03/2014
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/03/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 02/25/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 02/26/2014
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 04/01/2014
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 04/03/2014
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 04/03/2014
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 04/03/2014
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 04/03/2014
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/08/2014
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 04/28/2014
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 04/28/2014
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 04/28/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 05/01/2014
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/19/2014
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/21/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 05/28/2014
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 06/09/2014
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 06/09/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/09/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 06/09/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 06/12/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 06/18/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 06/23/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 06/24/2014
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/30/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 07/11/2014
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 07/14/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 07/18/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/18/2014
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 07/18/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/31/2014
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 08/01/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 09/15/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/16/2014
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/18/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 11/18/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/18/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 11/18/2014