Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 11/19/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 02/03/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 03/13/2014