Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 10/30/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/19/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 12/19/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 12/19/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 12/19/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/19/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 12/19/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/19/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 02/11/2014
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 02/11/2014
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/11/2014
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 02/11/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/11/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 05/08/2014
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 05/08/2014
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 05/08/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/08/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 05/08/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/08/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 06/09/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 06/09/2014
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/09/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/09/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/09/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 06/09/2014
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 06/09/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 06/09/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/09/2014
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 06/09/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 06/09/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 06/25/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/25/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/25/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 06/25/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/25/2014
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 06/25/2014
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 07/11/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 07/11/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 07/11/2014
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/17/2014
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 07/17/2014
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 07/17/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 07/17/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 07/31/2014
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 07/31/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 07/31/2014
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 07/31/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/18/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 09/18/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 09/18/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 11/14/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 11/14/2014
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 11/17/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/18/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 11/18/2014