Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 11/14/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/14/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 12/04/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 12/04/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 12/11/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/12/2013
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 02/11/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/18/2014