Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/15/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 02/10/2014
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 03/11/2014
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10] 06/24/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 09/09/2014