Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 10/30/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 12/09/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 12/09/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 12/09/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 12/09/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/16/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 12/16/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/07/2014
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 01/09/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 01/13/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 01/27/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/19/2014