Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 10/30/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/19/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 12/03/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 12/04/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/09/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 01/17/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/31/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/28/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/06/2014
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 05/07/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/08/2014